Jin et al v. U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Ying Jin and Mr. Victor H. Sparrow, III
Defendant: Mr. Gregory Collett, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv03214
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ying Jin, Victor H. Sparrow, III. Gregory Collett served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/13/2019. (c/m 12/13/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Ying Jin, Victor H. Sparrow, III or counsel for Ying Jin, Victor H. Sparrow, III are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/27/2019. (c/m 12/13/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m to Plaintiff 12/11/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that Plaintiff shall submit completed summons to the Clerk and the Clerk shall issue summons and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/4/2019. (c/m 12/5/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Correspondence from Victor H. Sparrow, III re: Status of Issuance of Summons (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Collett, U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637119129.), filed by Ying Jin, Victor H. Sparrow, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jin et al v. U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Gregory Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Ying Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Victor H. Sparrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?