Jones v. Livingston et al
Plaintiff: Andre Livingston and Simona Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv03220
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence sent to State Court re: Remand Letter to Circuit Court for Howard County (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/23/2019. (c/m 12/26/2019 bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Simona Jones, filed by Andre Livingston.(bas, Deputy Clerk)(EXHIBITS Recv'd 12/23/2019 FILED SEPARATELY) Modified on 12/26/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Andre Livingston. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Evidnece)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Simona Jones(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Andre Livingston. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-001407. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637035327), filed by Andre Livingston. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Table of Contents, #5 Connecticut Superior Court Separation Agreement, #6 Connecticut Superior Court Judgement, #7 Connecticut Superior Court Child Support Order, #8 Howard County Circuit Court Order Granting Registration, #9 Howard County Circuit Court Judgement, #10 Howard County Circuit Court Order Denyting Motion to Reconsider, #11 Howard County Circuit Court Order Striking Motion for New Trial, #12 Howard County Circuit Court Order to Reduce Arrears, #13 Howard County Circuit Court Order Denying Controlling Court Order and Stay, #14 Howard County Circuit Court Order of Circuit Court, #15 Order Denying Motion to Recons, #16 Howard County Circuit Court Order Granting Stay Enforcement, #17 Court of Special Appeals Unreported Opinion, #18 Court of Appeals Order Denying Writ of Certiorari and Motion, #19 Court of Special Appeals Unreported Opinion, #20 Court of Special Appeals Mandate, #21 Office of Administrative Hearings February 12, 2018Order re EWN Appeal, #22 Office of Administrative Hearings March 20, 2019 Orders re EWN Appeal, #23 Office of Administrative Hearings March 20, 2019 Order re Tax Intercept, #24 Baltimore City Circuit Court Order Affirming Office of Administrative Hearing February 2018 Decision)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Livingston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simona Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?