Campbell v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paula L. Campbell
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union LLC, Citizens Financial Group, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03240
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kari Morrigan. Directing attorney Kari Morrigan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kari A. Morrigan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8423168.) by Trans Union LLC(Schuckit, Robert)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/12/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED)ORDER granting #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/12/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/13/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re: Conference Call. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einstein, Joy)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Citizens Financial Group, Inc..(Houghton, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Adler, Nathan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Adler, Nathan)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/12/2019.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/25/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #4 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union LLC.(Schuckit, Robert)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/6/2019.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einstein, Joy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder In and Consent to Removal by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Adler, Nathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Adler, Nathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houghton, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Citizens Bank N.A. for Citizens Financial Group, Inc..(Houghton, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Adler, Nathan)
November 21, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Citizens Financial Group, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/29/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. Joinder In and Consent to Removal (Houghton, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Houghton on behalf of Citizens Financial Group, Inc. (Houghton, James)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Paula L. Campbell (Mack, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Trans Union LLC re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Trans Union, LLC's Statement Concerning Removal) (Schuckit, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Joinder In and Consent to Removal (Einstein, Joy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Einstein on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Einstein, Joy)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/8/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Paula L. Campbell(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Trans Union LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC, filed by Paula L. Campbell.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC.(Schuckit, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Schuckit on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Schuckit, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Of Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-c-19-005312. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8339506), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC)(Schuckit, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Schuckit
Represented By: Kari A Morrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Einstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula L. Campbell
Represented By: Joseph Mack
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?