The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland
Defendant: Specgx, LLC, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Michael Babich, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Actavis, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Allergan PLC, Jonathan Sackler, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., DOES 1 through 1000, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC, Amerisourcebergin Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Richard Sackler, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Howard J. Hoffberg, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A., John Kapoor, Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., David Sackler, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Norman B. Rosen, Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03254
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE re #43 Notice (Other), in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Ruling on its Motion to Remand filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 44 -PER COUNSEL, FILED IN ERROR. TO BE RE-FILED- RESPONSE re #42 Reply to Response to Motion, and Plantiff's Request for Expedited Ruling On its Motion to Remand Before the January 30, 2020 PML Hearing Session filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, William) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
December 23, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland re #25 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland and Request for Hearing, #42 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Ruling on its Motion to Remand [ECF No. 25] before the January 30, 2020 JPML Hearing Session (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sandler, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland and Request for Hearing filed by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Sandler, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #40 Supplemental, (McDaniel, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 Supplemental to #35 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McDaniel, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Clara N Kollm on behalf of Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Kollm, Clara)
December 18, 2019 Filing 38 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc..(Kollm, Clara)
December 12, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of State Court Documents by William Alden McDaniel, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental State Court Filings)(McDaniel, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (McDaniel, William)
December 10, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland and Request for Hearing filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, William)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by John Kapoor re #26 Response, Correction (Lee, Jamie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specgx, LLC re #32 Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Scott, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Specgx, LLC.(Scott, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE re #26 Response, #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (AMENDED) filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc..(McDaniel, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin Royer. Directing attorney Kevin Royer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cheryl Priest Ainsworth. Directing attorney Cheryl Priest Ainsworth to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey H Reeves. Directing attorney Jeffrey H Reeves to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (McDaniel, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc..(McDaniel, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland and Request for Hearing by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #20 Certain Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/26/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin N. Royer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370510.) by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland(Sandler, Paul)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cheryl Priest Ainsworth (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370445.) by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland(Sandler, Paul)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey H. Reeves (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370366.) by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland(Sandler, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint,,,,, by Actavis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stichel, Henry) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cardinal Health, Inc., Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 119, LLC for Cardinal Health 121, LLC; Other Affiliate Cardinal Health, Inc., Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 108, LLC for Cardinal Health 128, LLC; Other Affiliate Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.; Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 100, Inc..(McDaniel, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maraya Pratt on behalf of Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Pratt, Maraya)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle McGeogh on behalf of Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (McGeogh, Michelle)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Certain Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleasings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/19/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Mitchell, Michelle)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation was filed incorrectly. ***Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings > Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland (Sandler, Paul)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon W Johnson, III on behalf of John Kapoor (Johnson, Vernon)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Complaint,,,,, by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc..(McDaniel, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lee on behalf of John Kapoor (Lee, Jamie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardinal Health, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (McDaniel, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt, LLC.(Trasatti, Marisa)
November 13, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/13/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Amerisourcebergin Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., DOES 1 through 1000, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Howard J. Hoffberg, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Kapoor, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Norman B. Rosen, Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A., Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/19/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 The documents #3 and#6 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR)ORDER "Granting" defendants Vidaver,Maryland Healing Waters, LLC,Tham and PMPMA's motion to Dismiss as therein set forth. Signed by Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Judge on 5/28/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 30 days as to Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC.(slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR)COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., DOES 1 through 1000, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Kapoor, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Carroll County, Maryland, case number C-06-CV-19-000348. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637119332), filed by Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 100, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #3 Exhibit A - Lower Court Complaint 19-348, #4 Exhibit C) (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Mark Stichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergin Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 121, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 128, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 107, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100, Inc.
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard J. Hoffberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosen-Hoffberg Rehabilitation and Pain Management Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Jamie Lee
Represented By: Vernon W Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman B. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Clara N Kollm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County Commissioner of Carroll County, Maryland
Represented By: Paul Mark Sandler
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: Kevin Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?