Sumpter v. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dilan Sumpter
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03270
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response: The deadline for Defendant to file any response to the Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial is extended to January 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/23/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint ; Defendant's response is due January 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/12/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/10/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company or counsel for Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/24/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/14/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Dilan Sumpter or counsel for Dilan Sumpter are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/29/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8346862.), filed by Dilan Sumpter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Moore, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumpter v. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilan Sumpter
Represented By: Matthew J McCloskey
Represented By: John Marks Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?