Owl Feather-Gorbey v. State of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey
Defendant: State of Maryland, Administrative Office of Federal Courts, U.S. Department of Justice and Administrative Office of Maryland State Courts
Case Number: 1:2019cv03278
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence to Parties re: Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 11/14/19) (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02885. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE FORTHWITH to the USDC for the District of Maryland. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (adh, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Hearing by MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY (zsb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY (zsb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY (zsb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
September 24, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/24/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owl Feather-Gorbey v. State of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of Federal Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of Maryland State Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?