Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Defendant: Ross Contracting, Inc., Daniel Ross and Penn Shop Farms, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03331
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sergio F. Oehninger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8452799.) by Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, Ross Contracting, Inc.(Koyama, Perie)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, Ross Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koyama, Perie)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, Ross Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koyama, Perie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, Ross Contracting, Inc. (Koyama, Perie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Perie Reiko Koyama on behalf of Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, Ross Contracting, Inc. (Koyama, Perie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Penn Shop Farms, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019.(Jenkins, Peter)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Ross Contracting, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019.(Jenkins, Peter)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Daniel Ross served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019.(Jenkins, Peter)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, #7 Affidavit of Service filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons for Declaratory Relief served on Daniel Ross on November 21, 2019, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Jenkins, Peter) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons for Declaratory Relief served on Henry Clarke, Resident Agent for Ross Contracting Inc. on November 21, 2019, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Jenkins, Peter) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons for Declaratory Relief served on Henry Clarke, Resident Agent for Penn Shop Farms, LLC on November 21, 2019, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Jenkins, Peter) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company identifying Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial, Inc. for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Jenkins, Peter)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company was filed incorrectly. **The Corporate Disclosure must be filed as a separate entry not an attachment to the Complaint. Please refile your Corporate Disclosure by selecting the event under Other Documents -& Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement and add the corporate parent and/or affiliations when the system prompts you. The Disclosure Statement has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Penn Shop Farms, LLC, Daniel Ross, and Ross Contracting, Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8359230.), filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # (FILED IN ERROR) (2) Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Summons for Defendant Daniel Ross, #4 Summons Summons for Defendant Penn Shop Farms, LLC, #5 Summons Summons for Defendant Ross Contracting Inc.)(Jenkins, Peter) Modified on 11/20/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Perie Reiko Koyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ross
Represented By: Perie Reiko Koyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Shop Farms, LLC
Represented By: Perie Reiko Koyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Richard W Bryan
Represented By: Peter James Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?