Paice LLC et al v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG et al
Plaintiff: Paice LLC and The Abell Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G. and BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03348
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #26 Answer to Complaint (Answer to Counterclaims) filed by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc..(Ulwick, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 CORRECTED Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses to the Complaint by BMW of North America, LLC.(Dewey, Joel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dewey, Joel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses to the Complaint by BMW of North America, LLC.(Dewey, Joel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Kresh. Directing attorney Joshua Kresh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph P Lavelle. Directing attorney Joseph P Lavelle to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Kresh by BMW of North America, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Dewey, Joel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Lavelle by BMW of North America, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Dewey, Joel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by BMW of North America, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by BMW of North America, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Kresh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8399994.) by BMW of North America, LLC(Dewey, Joel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Lavelle (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8399956.) by BMW of North America, LLC(Dewey, Joel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian Livedalen. Directing attorney Brian Livedalen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Indranil Mukerji. Directing attorney Indranil Mukerji to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ruffin Beauregard Cordell. Directing attorney Ruffin Beauregard Cordell to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Livedalen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370296.) by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Indranil Mukerji (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370279.) by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ruffin B. Cordell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8370131.) by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc.. BMW of North America, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019.(Ulwick, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to BMW of North America, LLC, Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by The Abell Foundation, Inc., Paice LLC (Ulwick, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Summons to Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G.) (Ulwick, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 11/29/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by The Abell Foundation, Inc., Paice LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G. To correct this problem, file Summons for Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G. using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G. to #1 Complaint. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Abell Foundation (Ulwick, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Paice LLC (Ulwick, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8362721.), filed by Paice LLC, The Abell Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons)(Ulwick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paice LLC et al v. Bayerische Motoren Werke AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paice LLC
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Ruffin B. Cordell
Represented By: Brian Livedalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Abell Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Ruffin B. Cordell
Represented By: Brian Livedalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke, A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P Lavelle
Represented By: Joel A Dewey
Represented By: Joshua Kresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?