Gray Construction, Inc. v. Medline Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gray Construction, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: GEO-Technology Associates, Inc., Morris & Ritchie Associates, Inc., Allan Myers, L.P., DGS Construction, LLC and York Building Products Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03405
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT INTERLOCUTORY ORDER ESTABLISHING A MECHANIC'S LIEN re #20 Motion for entry of Consent Interlocutory Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/21/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION Entry of Consent Interlocutory Order Establishing a Mechanic's Lien by Gray Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(KUSHNER, KYLE)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Medline Industries, Inc. (McGeogh, Michelle)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 Third Party Summons Issued 21 days as to Allan Myers, L.P., DGS Construction, LLC, GEO-Technology Associates, Inc., Morris & Ritchie Associates, Inc., York Building Products Co., Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Morris & Ritchie Associates, Inc., DGS Construction, LLC t/a Schuster Concrete Construction, GEO-Technology Associates, Inc., Allan Myers, L.P., York Building Products Co., Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Gray Construction, Inc. by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kate Slattery, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - First Amendment to Agreement, #5 Exhibit C - MedlineGray Contract, #6 Exhibit D - SESI Global Evaluation Report, #7 Exhibit E - MRA Agreement, #8 Exhibit F - SESI Pavement Evaluation Summary, #9 Summons Third Party Defendants)(McGeogh, Michelle)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Other Relief For Telephonic Scheduling Conference filed by Medline Industries, Inc..(McGeogh, Michelle)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Other Relief For Telephonic Scheduling Conference by Gray Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kovars, Joseph)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Grote. Directing attorney Christopher Grote to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines CORRECTION: Medline Industries, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Medline Industries, Inc. answer due 1/23/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/6/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Medline Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGeogh, Michelle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher R. Grote (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8386975.) by Medline Industries, Inc.(McGeogh, Michelle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Maraya Pratt on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (Pratt, Maraya)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle McGeogh on behalf of Medline Industries, Inc. (McGeogh, Michelle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gray Construction, Inc.. Medline Industries, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019.(Kovars, Joseph)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gray Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gray, Inc., Other Affiliate Gray Partners, Inc., Other Affiliate Gray Construction Canada Company, Other Affiliate Gray Consulting Services, LLC for Gray Construction, Inc..(KUSHNER, KYLE)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion for Disclosure filed by Gray Construction, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" found in the category of Other Documents. Enter the name of each affiliate into the system when prompted. The Motion has been terminated. The document has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Interest by Gray Construction, Inc.(KUSHNER, KYLE) Modified on 12/3/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Medline Industries, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Gray Construction, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summons (Kovars, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint, filed by Gray Construction, Inc. **Summons were not attached. If you would like summons issued, please file prepared summons using the event "notice(other)" and link your filing to #1 complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Establish and Enforce Mechanic's Lien against Medline Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8372680.), filed by Gray Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Text of Proposed Order Show Cause Order)(Kovars, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray Construction, Inc. v. Medline Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C Grote
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C Kovars
Represented By: KYLE S KUSHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GEO-Technology Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Morris & Ritchie Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Allan Myers, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: DGS Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: York Building Products Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?