Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Underground Dispatch Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC, Underground Dispatch Services LLC, Andrew Freeman and Stephanie Burns
Case Number: 1:2019cv03413
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC or counsel for Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/17/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Enterprise RAC Company, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC.(Lapidus, Jack)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/27/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company or counsel for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/11/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Finamore, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8374150.), filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Finamore, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Underground Dispatch Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC
Represented By: Jack D Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underground Dispatch Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Jeffry Elliker
Represented By: Paul McDermott Finamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?