Big Birds, LLC v. CC Beauty Collection Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Big Birds, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10, President Stacy Kaufman, CC Beauty Collection Inc., Performance Brands, Inc., President Christine Medrick, Stacy Kaufman and Christine Medrick
Case Number: 1:2019cv03594
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 29 Second CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Braunstein by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Catron, Emily)
February 14, 2020 Filing 28 QC NOTICE: #22 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Stacy Kaufman, Performance Brands, Inc., CC Beauty Collection Inc., Christine Medrick needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2020 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patricia Flanagan. Directing attorney Patricia Flanagan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CC Beauty Collection Inc. (Braunstein, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Performance Brands, Inc. (Braunstein, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Corrected Declaration of Christine Medrick by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc.(Fletcher, Robert)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (FILED IN ERROR - SEE ECF 24) Attachment Medrick Declaration, #2 Attachment Kaufman Declaration)(Fletcher, Robert) Modified on 2/13/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 12, 2020 Filing 22 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Braunstein by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Catron, Emily)
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Fletcher on behalf of Christine Medrick (Fletcher, Robert)
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patricia Flanagan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8507939.) by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc.(Catron, Emily)
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Nicole Catron on behalf of Christine Medrick (Catron, Emily)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Big Birds, LLC. Christine Medrick waiver sent on 2/3/2020.(Hopkins, Julie)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark Berkowitz. Directing attorney Mark Berkowitz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Berkowitz by Big Birds, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hopkins, Julie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Big Birds, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Berkowitz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8474015.) by Big Birds, LLC(Hopkins, Julie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alex Braunstein. Directing attorney Alex Braunstein to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Braunstein (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8455976.) by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Performance Brands, Inc.(Catron, Emily)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Big Birds, LLC. Stacy Kaufman served on 12/23/2019.(Hopkins, Julie)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Big Birds, LLC. Performance Brands, Inc. served on 12/23/2019.(Hopkins, Julie)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Big Birds, LLC. CC Beauty Collection Inc. served on 12/23/2019.(Hopkins, Julie)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MARGINAL ORDER approving #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/9/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Performance Brands, Inc..(Catron, Emily)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Fletcher on behalf of CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Performance Brands, Inc. (Fletcher, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Nicole Catron on behalf of CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Performance Brands, Inc. (Catron, Emily)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Hopkins, Julie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Big Birds, LLC identifying Corporate Parent D & D Trading, LLC for Big Birds, LLC.(Hopkins, Julie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CC Beauty Collection Inc., Stacy Kaufman, Christine Medrick, Performance Brands, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/26/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 12/26/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8414403.), filed by Big Birds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CC Beauty Collection Inc. Summons, #3 Summons Christine Medrick Summons, #4 Summons Performance Brands, Inc. Summons, #5 Summons Stacy Kaufman Summons)(Hopkins, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Birds, LLC v. CC Beauty Collection Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Stacy Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC Beauty Collection Inc.
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Represented By: Patricia Flanagan
Represented By: Emily Nicole Catron
Represented By: Alex L Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Represented By: Patricia Flanagan
Represented By: Emily Nicole Catron
Represented By: Alex L Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Christine Medrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Kaufman
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Represented By: Patricia Flanagan
Represented By: Emily Nicole Catron
Represented By: Alex L Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Medrick
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Represented By: Patricia Flanagan
Represented By: Emily Nicole Catron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Birds, LLC
Represented By: Julie Ann Hopkins
Represented By: Mark Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?