Carter v. Norfolk Southern Corp.
Plaintiff: Keith M. Carter
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Incorporated and Norfolk Southern Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03671
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 5 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judg. Keith M. Carter must correct the following error(s): **U.S. Magistrate Judge Election Form is blank. Please complete and refile the form. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/31/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Keith M. Carter or counsel for Keith M. Carter are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/14/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Norfolk Southern Corp.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and request for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8426656.), filed by Keith M. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith M. Carter
Represented By: John Henry Morris, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?