Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. v. Stern, et al.
Defendant: Michael Stern, Estate of Gloria Levin, Paul Levin and Wendy Stern
Petitioner: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. and Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Estate of Gloria Levin, Paul Levin, Michael Stern, Wendy Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Respondents' Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit K to Respondents' Reply Memorandum, #3 Exhibit L to Respondents' Reply Memorandum, #4 Exhibit M to Respondents' Reply Memorandum)(Rosen, Marc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Edwin A. Zipf, Esq., #2 Attachment Exhibit A to the Declaration of Edwin A. Zipf, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #4 Attachment Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #5 Attachment Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #6 Attachment Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #7 Attachment Exhibit D to the Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #8 Attachment Exhibit E to the Declaration of Jeffrey Primiano, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #10 Attachment Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #11 Attachment Exhibit B to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #12 Attachment Exhibit C to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #13 Attachment Exhibit D to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #14 Attachment Exhibit E to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #15 Attachment Exhibit F to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #16 Attachment Exhibit G to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #17 Attachment Exhibit H to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #18 Attachment Exhibit I to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #19 Attachment Exhibit J to Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan, #20 Attachment Declaration of Priscilla A. Donovan, #21 Attachment Exhibit A to Declaration of Priscilla A. Donovan)(Zipf, Edwin)
January 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Estate of Gloria Levin, Paul Levin, Michael Stern, Wendy Stern (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Respondents' Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Respondents' Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support, #5 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support, #6 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support, #7 Exhibit E to Memorandum in Support, #8 Exhibit F to Memorandum in Support, #9 Exhibit G to Memorandum in Support, #10 Exhibit H to Memorandum in Support, #11 Exhibit I to Memorandum in Support, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Marc)
January 8, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew Mount. Directing attorney Andrew Mount to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/6/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edwin A Zipf. Directing attorney Edwin A Zipf to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/6/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew T. Mount (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8432644.) by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. (Donovan, Daniel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin A. Zipf (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8432586.) by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. (Donovan, Daniel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 32 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp., Other Affiliate Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Other Affiliate 1919 Investment Counsel, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Bank & Trust, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus Europe Limited, Other Affiliate Ziegler Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Eaton Partners, Other Affiliate Miller Buckfire & Co. LLC, Other Affiliate Century Securities Associates, Other Affiliate Stifel Bank, Other Affiliate Stifel Trust Company NA, Other Affiliate Stifel Trust Delaware NA for Steel Nicolaus & Co., Inc..(Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Plaintiff Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. or counsel for Steel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/17/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Issued 21 days as to Estate of Gloria Levin, Paul Levin, Michael Stern, Wendy Stern.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. Z to Decl of E. Zipf (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. Y to Decl of E. Zipf Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. X to Decl of E. Zipf (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. W to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. V to Decl of E. Zipf Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. U to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. T to Decl of Ed Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. S to Decl of E. Zipf Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. R to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. Q to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. P to Decl of Ed Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. O to Decl of Ed Zipf Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. N to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. M to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. L to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. K to E. Zipf Decl (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. J to Decl of Ed Zipf, Esq (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. I to Decl of E. Zipf (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. H to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. G to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. F to Decl of Ed Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. E to Decl of E. Zipf Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. D to Decl of E. Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. Ex. C to Decl of Ed Zipf, Esq. (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Exhibit B to Decl of E. Zipf (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Ex. A to Declaration of E. Zipf (Donovan, Priscilla)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Donovan on behalf of Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. (Donovan, Daniel)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR- counsel will re-file) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc..(Donovan, Priscilla) Modified on 1/3/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against Michael Stern, Wendy Stern, Paul Levin, Estate of Gloria Levin ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8429640.), filed by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Ed Zipf, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Donovan, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc. v. Stern, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Gloria Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Priscilla Alden Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Priscilla Alden Donovan
Represented By: Andrew Mount
Represented By: Edwin A Zipf
Represented By: Daniel J Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?