Wheeler, Jr. v. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Kenard Wheeler, Jr.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Kenard Wheeler, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case by Alex M. Azar, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/24/2020. (c/m 1/24/20 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kenard Wheeler, Jr.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Alex M. Azar, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff on 1/7/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Judge William C. Mulford, II on 12/17/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Judge William C. Mulford, IIon 12/6/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Judge William C. Mulford, II on 12/6/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II, filed by Kenard Wheeler, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, Maryland, case number C-02-CV-19-003122., filed by Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Complaint as filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit Summons as filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit Case Information Report as filed in State Court, #6 Exhibit Scheduling Order as filed in State Court, #7 Exhibit Order for Mediation as filed in State Court, #8 Exhibit Amended Order for Mediation as filed in State Court)(Marzullo, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler, Jr. v. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenard Wheeler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?