Lumsden et al v. US Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Wesley K. Lumsden and Kenneth D. Lumsden
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee successor in interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association as trustee for GSMPS 2004-1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and US Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00336
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wesley K. Lumsden. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Kenneth D. Lumsden, Wesley K. Lumsden. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., US Bank, NA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Diemer, Mary)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #3 Amended Complaint; Answers due 3/13/2020 as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., US Bank, NA. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/12/2020. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., US Bank, NA.(Diemer, Mary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., US Bank, NA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diemer, Mary) Modified on 2/12/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/10/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence from Clerk to Plaintiffs re: Removal Notification Letter. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WASHINGTON COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., US Bank, NA, filed by Wesley K. Lumsden, Kenneth D. Lumsden. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee successor in interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association as trustee for GSMPS 2004-1 Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to US District Court)(Diemer, Mary)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Washington County, Maryland, case number C-21-Cv-19-000683. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8502266), filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee successor in interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association as trustee for GSMPS 2004-1, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Summons, #3 Exhibit B. Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C. Letter to Circuit Court, #5 Exhibit D. Loan Analysis - Exhibit to Complaint, #6 Exhibit E. Mortgage Audit Report, #7 Exhibit F. Exhibit to Complaint, #8 Exhibit G. Summary of Findings, #9 Exhibit H. FDIC Report on Farmers and Mechanics as Closed, #10 Exhibit I. SDAT Search for Farmers and Mechanics National Bank, #11 Exhibit J. SDAT Report for 15809 National Pike)(Diemer, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumsden et al v. US Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee successor in interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association as trustee for GSMPS 2004-1
Represented By: Mary S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Mary S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mary S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Represented By: Mary S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley K. Lumsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Lumsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?