CB v. Hayes et al
Plaintiff: N E CB
Defendant: Deputy Director Kenneth Tota, FFS Hildamaria Powell, Assistant Secretary Lynn Johnson, Executive Director Olubunmi Akinkuowo, Acting Director Jonathan Hayes, Secretary Alex M Azar, II, Alex Azar, Kenneth Tota, Hildamaria Powell, Jonathan Hayes, Lynn Johnson and Olubunmi Akinkuowo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00391
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ORDER approving #15 Plaintiff-Petitioner N.E.C.B.'s Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/2/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by N E CB (Hsieh, Samantha)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Samantha Hsieh. Directing attorney Samantha Hsieh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samantha Hsieh by N E CB. The fee has already been paid.(Cubas, Claudia)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 4/10/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/19/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by N E CB needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued 60 days as to Olubunmi Akinkuowo, Alex Azar, Jonathan Hayes, Lynn Johnson, Hildamaria Powell, Kenneth Tota, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 Supplemental to #1 Complaint,, filed by N E CB Proposed Summons as to All Defendants (Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by N E CB (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samantha Hsieh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8515357.) by N E CB(Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental to #1 Complaint,, filed by N E CB Corrected Redacted Home Study Report (Cubas, Claudia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by N E CB. **Please file the unredacted documents using the event under Other Documents > Unredacted Document. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8513677.), filed by N E CB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Exhibit Psychological Evaluation (Redacted), # (FILED IN ERROR)(4) Exhibit Home Study Report (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Emails Between Counsel and Case Manager (Redacted), #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Habeas Petition)(Cubas, Claudia) Modified on 2/14/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CB v. Hayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Kenneth Tota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFS Hildamaria Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Secretary Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director Olubunmi Akinkuowo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Jonathan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildamaria Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olubunmi Akinkuowo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N E CB
Represented By: Claudia R. Cubas
Represented By: Samantha Hsieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?