Malone v. Peninsula Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Donna Lynn Malone, Donna Malone and Daniel Gosier
Defendant: Conmed, LLC, Dr. William Wild, RN Elizabeth Townsend, Peninsula Regional Medical Center, Emergency Service Assoc. PA, Dr. William A. Wild, Emergency Service Associates, P.A. and Elizabeth Townsend
Case Number: 1:2020cv00446
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Conmed, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wellpath, LLC for Conmed, LLC.(Goebel, Kelly)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Conmed, LLC.(Goebel, Kelly)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Goebel on behalf of Conmed, LLC (Goebel, Kelly)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Malone. William A. Wild waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020.(Bonadio, Nicholas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Malone. Emergency Service Associates, P.A. waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020.(Bonadio, Nicholas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Malone. Conmed, LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/27/2020.(Bonadio, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal w/prejudice filed by Donna Malone; Elizabeth Townsend (RN) terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/26/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Malone. Peninsula Regional Medical Center waiver sent on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020.(Bonadio, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT SERVICE DATE- COUNSEL TO REFILE) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Malone. Conmed, LLC waiver sent on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020.(Bonadio, Nicholas) Modified on 2/27/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donna Malone (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonadio, Nicholas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Conmed, LLC, Emergency Service Associates, P.A., Peninsula Regional Medical Center, Elizabeth Townsend, William A. Wild. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8525968.), filed by Donna Lynn Malone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment HCA Order of Transfer, #3 Attachment HCA Election to Waive Arbitration, #4 Attachment CQE & Report Baker, #5 Attachment CQE & Report Cervantes, #6 Summons Penninsula Regional, #7 Summons Emergency Service Associates, P.A., #8 Summons Elizabeth Townsend, RN, #9 Summons Dr. William Wild, #10 Summons Conmed, LLC)(Bonadio, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Peninsula Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conmed, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Marie Goebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Elizabeth Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peninsula Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Service Assoc. PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William A. Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Service Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lynn Malone
Represented By: Jay Dante Miller
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Bonadio
Represented By: Thomas W. Keilty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Malone
Represented By: Jay Dante Miller
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Bonadio
Represented By: Thomas W. Keilty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?