Aucker et al v. University of Maryland Medical System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wayne McCully, Leanne M. Baker, Judy A Hebbard, Danny L. Baker, Reginald A Brashears, Sr, Keith A Stancliff, Teresa M Stancliff, Deborah A McCully, Oleta K Graham, Andrea L. Aucker, Tammie E Lane, Mary L. Boddie, Diane Marut, Natasha F Queen, Soraya Brashears, Cathy J Paquet, George R Graham, Claudia Garrett, Richard Paquet and Dawn M Kellar
Defendant: Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc. and University of Maryland Medical System Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00543
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andrea L. Aucker, Danny L. Baker, Leanne M. Baker, Mary L. Boddie, Soraya Brashears, Reginald A Brashears, Sr, Claudia Garrett, George R Graham, Oleta K Graham, Judy A Hebbard, Dawn M Kellar, Tammie E Lane, Diane Marut, Deborah A McCully, Wayne McCully, Cathy J Paquet, Richard Paquet, Natasha F Queen, Teresa M Stancliff, Keith A Stancliff (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Craig)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation Defendants Certification Regarding State-Court Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Haiber, Scott)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING #16 Stipulation filed by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/13/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Jointly Filed with Plaintiffs by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation (Haiber, Scott)
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation.(Haiber, Scott)
March 13, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by RFD Management, LLC (Sly, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Emergency Physicians, Inc., Other Affiliate Arundel Physicians Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Healthcare Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Medical Center Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Professional Services, Inc., Other Affiliate BW Health Services, LLC, Other Affiliate NAH/Sunrise of Severna Park, LLC, Other Affiliate North Arundel Development Corporation, Other Affiliate North Arundel Pet Center, LLC, Other Affiliate North Arundel Senior Living, LLC, Other Affiliate North County Corporation, Other Affiliate Arundel Physicians Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Healthcare Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Mobile Care, LLC, Other Affiliate North Arundel Executive Building Condominium Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Shipley Choice Medical Park, Inc, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Medical System Corporation for Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc..(Haiber, Scott)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by University of Maryland Medical System Corporation identifying Other Affiliate University of Maryland Medical Center, Other Affiliate Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Other Affiliate University of Maryland Shore Regional Health, Other Affiliate Mt. Washington Pediatric Hospital, Other Affiliate University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Medical Center Midtown Campus, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Upper Chesapeake Health, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Capital Region Health, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Charles Regional Medical Center, Other Affiliate University of Maryland Rehabilitation & Orthopaedic Institute for University of Maryland Medical System Corporation.(Haiber, Scott)
February 28, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/6/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/28/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Andrea L. Aucker et al., Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation or counsel for Andrea L. Aucker et al., Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/13/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/28/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Andrea L. Aucker, Danny L. Baker, Leanne M. Baker, Mary L. Boddie, Soraya Brashears, Reginald A Brashears, Sr, Claudia Garrett, George R Graham, Oleta K Graham, Judy A Hebbard, Dawn M Kellar, Tammie E Lane, Diane Marut, Deborah A McCully, Wayne McCully, Cathy J Paquet, Richard Paquet, Natasha F Queen, Teresa M Stancliff, Keith A Stancliff (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant University of Maryland Medical System, #2 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., #3 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Randy Davis, M.D., #4 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant RFD Management, LLC, #5 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant University of Maryland Medical System, #6 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., #7 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Randy Davis, M.D., #8 Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to RFD Management, LLC) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Election to Waive Arbitration by Andrea L. Aucker, Danny L. Baker, Leanne M. Baker, Mary L. Boddie, Soraya Brashears, Reginald A Brashears, Sr, Claudia Garrett, George R Graham, Oleta K Graham, Judy A Hebbard, Dawn M Kellar, Tammie E Lane, Diane Marut, Deborah A McCully, Wayne McCully, Cathy J Paquet, Richard Paquet, Natasha F Queen, Teresa M Stancliff, Keith A Stancliff (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., Randy Davis, M.D., RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, filed by Teresa M Stancliff, Natasha F Queen, Claudia Garrett, Tammie E Lane, Soraya Brashears, Mary L. Boddie, Judy A Hebbard, Andrea L. Aucker, Diane Marut, George R Graham, Cathy J Paquet, Deborah A McCully, Wayne McCully, Leanne M. Baker, Reginald A Brashears, Sr, Oleta K Graham, Keith A Stancliff, Dawn M Kellar, Richard Paquet, Danny L. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report)(ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-000076. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8542604), filed by RFD Management, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, Randy Davis, M.D., Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Index of Documents Served on Defendants, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A: Civil-Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B: Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C: Election to Waive Arbitration and Corresponding Order of Transfer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D: Writ of Summons Issued to All Defendants, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers Notice of Discovery, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant University of Maryland Medical System, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., #10 Exhibit Exhibit H: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Randy Davis, M.D., #11 Exhibit Exhibit I: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant RFD Management, LLC, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant University of Maryland Medical System, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc., #14 Exhibit Exhibit L: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Randy Davis, M.D., #15 Exhibit Exhibit M: Plaintiff Andrea Auckers First Set of Request for Production of Documents to RFD Management, LLC, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with Baltimore City Circuit Court)(Haiber, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aucker et al v. University of Maryland Medical System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne McCully
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne M. Baker
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A Hebbard
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L. Baker
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald A Brashears, Sr
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A Stancliff
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M Stancliff
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A McCully
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleta K Graham
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Aucker
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie E Lane
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Boddie
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Marut
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha F Queen
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya Brashears
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy J Paquet
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R Graham
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Garrett
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Paquet
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M Kellar
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Davis, M.D.
Represented By: Barry Craig Goldstein
Represented By: John T Sly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFD Management, LLC
Represented By: Barry Craig Goldstein
Represented By: John T Sly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Washington Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Schultz Colton
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Nicholas Adam Szokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Medical System Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Schultz Colton
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Nicholas Adam Szokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?