McPherson et al v. Baltimore Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth McPherson and Eric Simmons
Defendant: Dave Neverdon, Frank Barlow, Baltimore Police Department, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Unknown Employees of the Baltimore Police Department, Robert Patton, Detective Dave Neverdon, Detective Frank Barlow, Detective Richard Garvey, Detective Robert Patton and Detective Gilbert
Case Number: 1:2020cv00795
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Complaint by Frank Barlow, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Dave Neverdon, Robert Patton.(Nathan, Shneur)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Arnold on behalf of Frank Barlow, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Dave Neverdon, Robert Patton (Arnold, Judson)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Kamionski on behalf of Frank Barlow, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Dave Neverdon, Robert Patton (Kamionski, Avi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shneur Zalman Nathan on behalf of Frank Barlow, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Dave Neverdon, Robert Patton (Nathan, Shneur)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara K Lynch on behalf of Baltimore Police Department (Lynch, Kara)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Baltimore Police Department waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Frank Barlow waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Richard Garvey waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Gilbert waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Dave Neverdon waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. Robert Patton waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020.(Spence, Renee)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Renee Spence. Directing attorney Renee Spence to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Renee Spence (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8612028.) by Kenneth McPherson, Eric Simmons(Horn, Gayle)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Rose Amato on behalf of Baltimore Police Department (Amato, Natalie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore Police Department, Frank Barlow, Richard Garvey, Gilbert, Dave Neverdon, Robert Patton. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8588732.), filed by Eric Simmons, Kenneth McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Proposed) for Frank Barlow, #3 Summons (Proposed) for Dave Neverdon, #4 Summons (Proposed) for Richard Garvey, #5 Summons (Proposed) for the Baltimore Police Department, #6 Summons (Proposed) for Detective Gilbert, #7 Summons (Proposed) for Robert Patton)(Horn, Gayle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson et al v. Baltimore Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Neverdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Police Department
Represented By: Kara K Lynch
Represented By: Natalie Rose Amato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees of the Baltimore Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Dave Neverdon
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Judson Arnold
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Frank Barlow
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Judson Arnold
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Richard Garvey
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Judson Arnold
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Robert Patton
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Judson Arnold
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Gilbert
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Judson Arnold
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth McPherson
Represented By: Gayle Horn
Represented By: Renee Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Simmons
Represented By: Gayle Horn
Represented By: Renee Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?