Ambimjb, LLC v. Strategic Armory Corps, LLC
Plaintiff: Ambimjb, LLC
Defendant: Strategic Armory Corps, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00807
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/8/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Discovery For Entry of Confidentiality Order by Strategic Armory Corps, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Willman, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/23/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Dorsey, Gregory)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/22/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/22/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2020 Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2020 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar.(Court Reporter: None) (mds, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #13 Order, filed by Ambimjb, LLC.(Dorsey, Gregory)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #9 Standing Order, filed by Ambimjb, LLC.(Dorsey, Gregory) Modified on 4/9/2020 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (NOTICE) re entering Scheduling Order; directing Counsel shall respond to this Notice within three days of this Notices date of signature whether they would be able to engage in the discovery process without running afoul of Government guidelines related to the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/7/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim by Ambimjb, LLC.(Dorsey, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Strategic Armory Corps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FJAS Corporation for Strategic Armory Corps, LLC, Strategic Armory Corps, LLC.(Tiller, Steven)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ambimjb, LLC (Dorsey, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/30/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against Ambimjb, LLC, filed by Strategic Armory Corps, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Strategic Armory Corps, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Civil Track Assignment and Scheduling Order. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ambimjb, LLC. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Strategic Armory Corps, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Strategic Armory Corps, LLC, filed by Ambimjb, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY, MD, case number C-03-CV-19-003075., filed by AMBIMJB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment COMPLAINT AND CIVIL CASE INFORMATION REPORT, #2 Attachment WRIT OF SUMMONS, #3 Attachment AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, #4 Attachment ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, #5 Attachment NOTICE OF CIVIL TRACK ASSIGNMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER, #6 Attachment FIRST NOSD MATERIALS BY AMBI, #7 Attachment NOTICE OF SERVICE, #8 Attachment SECOND NOSD MATERIALS BY AMBI, #9 Attachment DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS BY AMBI, #10 Attachment COUNTERCLAIM OF SAC)(Dorsey, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambimjb, LLC v. Strategic Armory Corps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambimjb, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Dorsey
Represented By: Syed Shaun Aguite Bokhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Armory Corps, LLC
Represented By: Steven Edward Tiller
Represented By: Timothy Willman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?