Longstreet v. Bailey
Plaintiff: Wysan Raheen Longstreet
Defendant: Bailey
Case Number: 1:2020cv00918
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Wysan Raheen Longstreet ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; due to COVID-19 defendant is granted an additional 30 days. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-05/26/2020 & emailed-05/26/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Correspondence from Plaintiff(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Wysan Raheen Longstreet (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence from Plaintiff(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Status of case(ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing the Finance Officer at JCI to File an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/14/2020. (c/m 4/24/2020)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wysan Raheen Longstreet(ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bailey, filed by Wysan Raheen Longstreet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Summons, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longstreet v. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wysan Raheen Longstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?