Curtin et al v. Cyprus Amax Minerals Company et al
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Cartwright, Laura Elizabeth Curtin, Andrew C Curtin, Delaney Ann Curtin and Charles Hugh Cartwright
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company and Avon Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00921
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Betty Ann Cartwright, Charles Hugh Cartwright, Andrew C Curtin, Delaney Ann Curtin, Laura Elizabeth Curtin.(Amato, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Filing 28 QC NOTICE: #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Avon Products, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please make address change by selecting Utilities > Your Account > Manage Your Account. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Vacate; #23 Order; #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Betty Ann Cartwright, Charles Hugh Cartwright, Andrew C Curtin, Delaney Ann Curtin, Laura Elizabeth Curtin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - email to counsel)(Amato, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 12, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Vacate #23 Order re #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Joshua)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/29/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Vacate #23 Order by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kahn, Joshua)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (VACATED, See ECF 25) ORDER re #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Andrew C Curtin. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/28/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/29/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
April 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrew C Curtin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - email)(Amato, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Request for Hearing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, Robin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 20 Correspondence re: Statement regarding Removal (Brown, Edward)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER re #18 MOTION for Other Relief Substituting Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. The Court directs any party who opposes the Motion for Other Relief (ECF No. 18) shall submit a response within 7 days of the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/20/2020. (vdcs, Chambers)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Other Relief Substituting Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Newport, Joel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Avon Products, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nature & Co. for Avon Products, Inc..(Brown, Edward)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction by Avon Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Edward)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Joseph Brown on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (Brown, Edward)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Marie McAuliffe on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (McAuliffe, Taylor)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company identifying Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation, f/k/a Phelps Dodge Corporation, Corporate Parent Freeport-McMoRan Inc., Other Affiliate Lloyd's of London, Other Affiliate North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate AETNA Casualty and Surety Co., Other Affiliate National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Other Affiliate CNA Casualty of California, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Co., Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company of Omaha (ACE), Other Affiliate Unigard Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ESLIC, Other Affiliate Granite Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Manhattan Fire Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Columbia Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Stonewall Insurance Company for Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Newport, Joel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A & B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Newport, Joel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Kahn, Joshua)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Franklin Kahn on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Kahn, Joshua)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Haslup on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Haslup, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/8/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE BALTIMORE CITY CIRCUIT COURT. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Documents Served in State Court Case by Betty Ann Cartwright, Charles Hugh Cartwright, Andrew C Curtin, Delaney Ann Curtin, Laura Elizabeth Curtin (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Election for Jury Trial by Betty Ann Cartwright, Charles Hugh Cartwright, Andrew C Curtin, Delaney Ann Curtin, Laura Elizabeth Curtin (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Avon Products, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed by Delaney Ann Curtin, Laura Elizabeth Curtin, Charles Hugh Cartwright, Andrew C Curtin, Betty Ann Cartwright. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Silver, Robin)
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24x20000018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8604764), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint in State Case, #3 Exhibit 2 - J&J's Answer in State Court Case, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Documents Served in State Court Case)(Silver, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtin et al v. Cyprus Amax Minerals Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Robin Silver
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Represented By: Taylor Marie McAuliffe
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Cartwright
Represented By: John Amato, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Elizabeth Curtin
Represented By: John Amato, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew C Curtin
Represented By: John Amato, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaney Ann Curtin
Represented By: John Amato, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hugh Cartwright
Represented By: John Amato, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?