Rash et al v. Noble et al
Plaintiff: Sally Rash and Charles Rash
Defendant: M.D. Helen Noble, Internal Medicine Associates, LLC and Helen Noble
Case Number: 1:2020cv00926
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Rash, Sally Rash. Helen Noble served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020.(Nakamura, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Rash, Sally Rash. Internal Medicine Associates, LLC served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020.(Nakamura, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Internal Medicine Associates, LLC, Helen Noble. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8605657.), filed by Charles Rash, Sally Rash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order of Transfer, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons proposed Summons - Noble, #4 Summons proposed Summons - IMA)(Nakamura, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rash et al v. Noble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Rash
Represented By: Michael Vincent Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rash
Represented By: Michael Vincent Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Helen Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Medicine Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?