Unkelbach v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samantha Unkelbach
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01048
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 5:7101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MARGINAL ORDER approving #13 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Samantha Unkelbach. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/3/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Samantha Unkelbach(Nowicki, John)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morell, Rafael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Removal (Morell, Rafael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Morell, Rafael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. was filed incorrectly. ***The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/23/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR-CLERICAL ERROR)Defendant's Notice of Removal by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/23/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
April 22, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Case Information Report by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 PETITIONER'S PETITION TO COMPEL AND ORDER ARBITRATION against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., filed by Samantha Unkelbach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, case number C-12-CV-20-000267. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8622599), filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morell, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unkelbach v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Unkelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Morell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?