White v. NewRez, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Marceline White
Defendant: NewRez, LLC, d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Federal National Mortgage Association and NewRez, LLC, doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 1:2020cv01259
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marceline White.(Robinson, Phillip)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Marceline White re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (to correct certain misnomers) (Robinson, Phillip)
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 103-5 Certification(Dhyani, Joshua)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Amber Knight, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Narod, Andrew)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Sky Woodward on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC, (Woodward, Tara)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,.(Dhyani, Joshua)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint and Motion to Certify a Class and Subclass. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/27/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marceline White (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 (Note), #3 Exhibit 2 (Shellpoint Accounting), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint and Motion to Certify a Class and Subclass by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dhyani, Joshua)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition II, LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corporation for NewRez, LLC,.(Narod, Andrew)
May 21, 2020 Deficiency Notice as to NewRez, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/28/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/21/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-10) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC, (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify a Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Representatives and Class Counsel Pursuant to MD Rule 2-231 by Marceline White (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marceline White (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,, filed by Marceline White. (Attachments: #1 Redline Amended Complaint)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marceline White. Federal National Mortgage Association served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020; NewRez, LLC, served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 30 days as to Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip R Robinson on behalf of Marceline White (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Line Requesting Summons by Marceline White (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC,, filed by Marceline White. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, Maryland, case number C-02-CV-001060. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8660099), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, NewRez, LLC, d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Initial Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Writ of Summons to NewRez, LLC, #5 Exhibit D - Writ of Summons to Fannie Mae, #6 Exhibit E - Motion to Certify a Class and Subclass, #7 Exhibit F - State Court Notice, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavits of Service)(Narod, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. NewRez, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC, d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Joshua Dhyani
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Joshua Dhyani
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC, doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Joshua Dhyani
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marceline White
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?