Eddo et al v. Harner
Plaintiff: Sarah Ann Biggers and Olakunle Johnson Eddo
Defendant: Cameron Riley Harner
Case Number: 1:2020cv01373
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Correspondence from Clerk to Circuit Court for Baltimore City re: Remand of Case (c/m ols, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2020: #1 Receipt of Case from Circuit Court for Baltimore City) (ols, Deputy Clerk).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion to Remand to State Court; Directing case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Baltimore City; Denying #7 and #9 as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/17/2020. (c/m ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/18/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Riley Harner (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sampson, Adam)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Riley Harner(Sampson, Adam)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that by 06/29/2020, defendant shall provide the Court with the ground(s) for remand as well as legal authority. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/15/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Riley Harner(Sampson, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Draft Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/3/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/2/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Cameron Riley Harner (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Cameron Riley Harner. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cameron Riley Harner, filed by Olakunle Johnson Eddo, Sarah Ann Biggers. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-001935. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8678502), filed by Cameron Riley Harner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment)(Sampson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddo et al v. Harner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ann Biggers
Represented By: Sidney Schupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olakunle Johnson Eddo
Represented By: Sidney Schupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Riley Harner
Represented By: Adam Thomas Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?