Hawkins et al v. Barakat
Plaintiff: Julius Francis, Sr. and Kelsi Hawkins
Defendant: M.D. Linda D. Barakat
Case Number: 1:2020cv01386
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Linda D. Barakat Notice of Service of Discovery (McManus, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Julius Francis, Sr, Kelsi Hawkins of Discovery (Zuber, Justin)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/23/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re: Discovery)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Status Report Submitted to Judge Hollander by Julius Francis, Sr, Kelsi Hawkins (Zuber, Justin)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER to Counsel re: Draft Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/26/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Linda D. Barakat identifying Corporate Parent Medical Mutual Liabiilty Insurance Society of Maryland for Linda D. Barakat.(McManus, David)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Linda D. Barakat.(McManus, David)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelsi Hawkins, Julius Francis, Sr. Linda D. Barakat served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020.(Zuber, Justin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT SERVICE DATE) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelsi Hawkins, Julius Francis, Sr. Linda D. Barakat served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020.(Zuber, Justin) Modified on 6/11/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Kelsi Hawkins, Julius Francis, Sr. was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavit under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Exhibits served on Defendant on June 3, 2020, filed by Julius Francis, Sr, Kelsi Hawkins.(Zuber, Justin) Modified on 6/11/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Linda D. Barakat. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Julius Francis, Sr, Kelsi Hawkins re #1 Complaint Summons (Zuber, Justin)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8678944.), filed by Kelsi Hawkins, Julius Francis, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Zuber, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins et al v. Barakat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Francis, Sr.
Represented By: Justin P Zuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsi Hawkins
Represented By: Justin P Zuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Linda D. Barakat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?