Henry v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cheana Henry
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Genral Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01443
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/12/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 Correspondence re: Status (Mehigan, James)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCount III by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehigan, James)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint Counts I and II by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company.(Mehigan, James)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Mehigan, James)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/4/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Courtesy Copy Cover Letter, #2 Declaration of Meghan Minton) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company, filed by Cheana Henry. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Genral Insurance Company (Mehigan, James)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Genral Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Filing Civil Coversheet (Mehigan, James)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baltimore City Circuit Court, case number 24-C-20-001955 MT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8681537), filed by Liberty Mutual Genral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Mehigan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheana Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Genral Insurance Company
Represented By: James Charles Mehigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?