Kumar v. First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V.
Plaintiff: Dharmendra Kumar
Defendant: First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01497
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/9/2020. (c/m 7/10/2020) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aguirre, Samir)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V.. (c/m 6/23/2020)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14637123121 (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to submit completed summons. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/8/2020. (c/m 6/8/2020)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V. (Filing fee $ 400 (Receipt # check in vault)), filed by Dharmendra Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar v. First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharmendra Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Abu Dhabi Bank USA N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?