Barnes v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valmeka Barnes
Defendant: Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01810
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Financial Recovery Services, Inc..(Canter, Ronald)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valmeka Barnes. Financial Recovery Services, Inc. served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020.(Stein, Aryeh)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/8/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Financial Recovery Services, Inc. (Canter, Ronald)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Financial Recovery Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Ronald)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Financial Recovery Services, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Financial Recovery Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8700347.), filed by Valmeka Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons)(Stein, Aryeh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald S Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valmeka Barnes
Represented By: Aryeh E. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?