Burwell v. Financial Management Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannell Burwell
Defendant: Monica Guilarte, Financial Management Solutions, LLC and The Law Office of Monica Guilarte, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01859
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Financial Management Solutions, LLC (Canter, Ronald)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Financial Management Solutions, LLC answer due 9/4/2020.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/14/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Financial Management Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Ronald)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shannell Burwell. The Law Office of Monica Guilarte, LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Ortega, Chelsea)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shannell Burwell. Monica Guilarte waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Ortega, Chelsea)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannell Burwell. Financial Management Solutions, LLC served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ortega, Chelsea)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Financial Management Solutions, LLC, Monica Guilarte, The Law Office of Monica Guilarte, LLC.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8710404.), filed by Shannell Burwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Financial Management Solutions, LLC, #3 Summons Monica Guilarte, #4 Summons The Law Office of Monica Guilarte, LLC)(Ortega, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burwell v. Financial Management Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Guilarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Management Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of Monica Guilarte, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannell Burwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Vocci
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Represented By: Jane Santoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?