Wade et al v. Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Pickett-Wade and Mark Wade
Defendant: Jonathan Pasterick, Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A., Brian Lyman, Jonathan E. Pasterick and Brian D. Lyman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01958
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/20/2020. (vals, Chambers)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A., Brian D. Lyman, Jonathan E. Pasterick (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickerman, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Dickerman on behalf of All Defendants (Dickerman, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020; Jonathan E. Pasterick served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A., Brian D. Lyman, Jonathan E. Pasterick.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8733586.), filed by Mark Wade, Teresa Pickett-Wade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sumons for Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A., #3 Summons Summons for Brian Lyman, #4 Summons Summons for Jonathan Pasterick)(Ortega, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade et al v. Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pasterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillman, Brown and Darrow, P.A.
Represented By: James Edward Dickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan E. Pasterick
Represented By: James Edward Dickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Lyman
Represented By: James Edward Dickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pickett-Wade
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wade
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?