Tessemae's LLC v. McDevitt et al
Plaintiff: Tessemae's LLC
Defendant: Alex Chehansky, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Legal Group LLC, Herman Dunst, Brendan Connors, Tandem Growth Group LLC and Paul Intlekofer
Case Number: 1:2020cv02013
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, and Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Exhibits same as original so not being re-filed), #2 Exhibit Redline Showing Changes in Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit Redline Showing Changes to Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #15 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tessemae's LLC.(Docherty, Kevin)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MARGINAL ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Disclosure of Corporate Interest. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/26/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Herman Dunst, Tandem Legal Group LLC, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Alex Chehansky, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Brendan Connors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Coburn, Barry)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Exhibit Four, #6 Exhibit Five, #7 Exhibit Six, #8 Exhibit Seven)(Coburn, Barry)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC Regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Coburn, Barry)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/7/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time (Second Request) by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Disclosure of Corporate Interest by Tessemae's LLC re #14 MOTION to Seal Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Attachments: #1 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest)(Levy, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Disclosure of Corporate Interest by Tessemae's LLC(Levy, Andrew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Osborne Strawbridge on behalf of Tessemae's LLC (Strawbridge, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Statement Regarding Removal) (Coburn, Barry)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC, filed by Tessemae's LLC. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint - Redlined Version)(Levy, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Coburn, Barry)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Consent Motion to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/14/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Docherty on behalf of Tessemae's LLC (Docherty, Kevin)
July 9, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Tandem Legal Group LLC and for Tandem Growth Group LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/16/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Tandem Growth Group LLC, Herman Dunst, Michael S. McDevitt, Alex Chehansky, Paul Intlekofer, Brendan Connors, Tandem Legal Group LLC was filed incorrectly. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. **Exhibits were not filed as separate PDF attachments. The Clerk separated the Exhibits into individual PDF documents on your behalf this time. Please note for future filings that all Exhibits or Attachments MUST be labeled and attached individually. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/9/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tessemae's LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Legal Group LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alex Chehansky, Brendan Connors, Herman Dunst, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Tandem Legal Group LLC, filed by Tessemae's LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, MD, case number C-03-CV-20-002390. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8744708), filed by Herman Dunst, Tandem Legal Group LLC, Paul Intlekofer, Michael S. McDevitt, Alex Chehansky, Tandem Growth Group LLC, Brendan Connors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coburn, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessemae's LLC v. McDevitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Chehansky
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. McDevitt
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandem Legal Group LLC
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Dunst
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Connors
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandem Growth Group LLC
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Intlekofer
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessemae's LLC
Represented By: James Osborne Strawbridge
Represented By: Kevin D. Docherty
Represented By: Andrew D Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?