Gravely v. State of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Steven Gravely, Jr.
Defendant: Scott D. Shellenberger, State of Maryland, Perry Wasserman, Det. K. Burrows, Hannah Bruchman, Det. S. Kilpatrick and Baltimore County Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv02031
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Gravely, Jr. ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/12/2020. (c/m 8/12/2020)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 14637124163 (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: granting Plaintiff 28 days to pay $50.00 towards the full filing fee.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/29/2020. (c/m 7/29/2020) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 14637123886 (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; dismissing defendants State of Maryland, Scott D. Shellenberger,Perry Wasserman, and Hannah Bruhman; dismissing claims against BCPD, Det. S. Kilpatrick, and Det. K. Burrows for injunctive and declaratory relief; Claims alleging harsh conditions of confinement shall proceed; directing Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary sheet. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/17/2020. (c/m 7/17/2020) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven Gravely, Jr(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Gravely, Jr(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Police Department, Hannah Bruchman, K. Burrows, S. Kilpatrick, Scott D. Shellenberger, State of Maryland, Perry Wasserman, filed by Steven Gravely, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gravely v. State of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Shellenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. K. Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Bruchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. S. Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gravely, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?