Silvestri v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mark Nicholas Silvestri
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2020cv02080
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Nicholas Silvestri. Andrew M Saul served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020.(Nicoll, William)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/21/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew M Saul (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mark Nicholas Silvestri re #1 Complaint (Nicoll, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8757880.), filed by Mark Nicholas Silvestri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nicoll, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvestri v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nicholas Silvestri
Represented By: William James Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?