Platts-Pretorious v. Platts
Plaintiff: Ilza Platts-Pretorious
Defendant: Jason Platts
Case Number: 1:2020cv02084
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/11/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Ilza Platts-Pretorious (McLawsen, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory Hortman McLawsen. Directing attorney Gregory Hortman McLawsen to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ilza Platts-Pretorious. Jason Platts waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020.(Neufville, Edward)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Hortman McLawsen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8787227.) by Ilza Platts-Pretorious (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neufville, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jason Platts.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Form I-864, Affidavit of Support against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758513.), filed by Ilza Platts-Pretorious. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Jason Platts, #3 Exhibit Form I-864 Redacted)(Neufville, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platts-Pretorious v. Platts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Platts
Represented By: Marysabel Rodriguez-Nanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilza Platts-Pretorious
Represented By: Edward Dosa Wea Neufville, III
Represented By: Gregory Hortman McLawsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?