Reynolds v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Reynolds
Defendant: Tokio Marine America Insurance Company and Aja Imani Clark
Case Number: 1:2020cv02087
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/27/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Deficiency Notice to Defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/3/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conti, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Michael Conti on behalf of Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Conti, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aja Imani Clark, Tokio Marine America Insurance Company.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758836.), filed by Barbara Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Aja Clark, #3 Summons Defendant Tokio Marine)(Trevillian, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine America Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aja Imani Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Reynolds
Represented By: William Trevillian, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?