Hammons v. University of Maryland Medical System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Hammons
Defendant: University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC and UMSJ Health System, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02088
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Mach. Directing attorney Daniel Mach to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Abigail E Marion. Directing attorney Abigail E Marion to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua A Block. Directing attorney Joshua A Block to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonah Knobler. Directing attorney Jonah Knobler to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew D Cohen. Directing attorney Andrew D Cohen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aron Fischer. Directing attorney Aron Fischer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 30 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Mach by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 29 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Abigail E. Marion by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua A. Block by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonah M. Knobler by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew D. Cohen by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 25 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer by Jesse Hammons. The fee has already been paid.(Ebert, Louis)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Imad S Matini. Directing attorney Imad S Matini to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul A Werner. Directing attorney Paul A Werner to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Permission for Plaintiff to Omit Home Address from Caption. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/11/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Other Relief Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Permission for Plaintiff to Omit Home Address from Caption by Jesse Hammons (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Jesse Hammons, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebert, Louis)
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jesse Hammons needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/7/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by UMSJ Health System, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giraudo, Denise)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Imad Matini (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8797955.) by UMSJ Health System, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Giraudo, Denise)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Werner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8797925.) by UMSJ Health System, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Giraudo, Denise)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Elizabeth Giraudo on behalf of All Defendants (Giraudo, Denise)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie Cooper (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790513.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Abigail E. Marion (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790161.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonah M. Knobler (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790149.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790138.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew D. Cohen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790125.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua A. Block (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8790110.) by Jesse Hammons(Ebert, Louis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesse Hammons. UMSJ Health System, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020; University of Maryland Medical System Corporation served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020; University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ebert, Louis)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to UMSJ Health System, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UMSJ Health System, LLC, University of Maryland Medical System Corporation, University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758894.), filed by Jesse Hammons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ebert, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammons v. University of Maryland Medical System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Medical System Corporation
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Represented By: Denise Elizabeth Giraudo
Represented By: Imad S Matini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland St. Joseph Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Represented By: Denise Elizabeth Giraudo
Represented By: Imad S Matini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMSJ Health System, LLC
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Represented By: Denise Elizabeth Giraudo
Represented By: Imad S Matini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Hammons
Represented By: Louis J Ebert
Represented By: Aron Fischer
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Andrew D Cohen
Represented By: Jonah Knobler
Represented By: Joshua A Block
Represented By: Abigail E Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?