Wohlberg v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wohlberg
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02093
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Wohlberg. Ethicon, Inc. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Justin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8760200.), filed by Elizabeth Wohlberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ethicon, Inc., #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson)(Browne, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wohlberg v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wohlberg
Represented By: Justin Anthony Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?