Davis v. DBG Property Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Davis
Defendant: DBG Property Management LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., DBG Property Management LLC doing business as Renters Warehouse and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02097
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Davis (Mack, Joseph)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/13/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DBG Property Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hodges, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/4/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to DBG Property Management LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8760402.), filed by James Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DBG Summons, #3 Summons Experian Summons)(Goldson, Ingmar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. DBG Property Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Represented By: Joseph Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBG Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBG Property Management LLC doing business as Renters Warehouse
Represented By: Daniel R Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?