Brightwell v. Kasahun, MD et al
Plaintiff: David Brightwell
Defendant: Regional Medical Director, Temesgen Kasahun, MD, JCI Hospital Administrator, Ms. Hargraves, Esphani Nazmin, MD and Corizon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02106
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Brightwell, filed by David Brightwell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits Page 1 Exhibit-FILED SEPARATELY)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Brightwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Acct Summary)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing clerk to docket ECF 2-2 as a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Paupris and shall docket ECF 2-3 as an exhibit; Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect that Ms. Hargraves, JCI Hospital Administrator, Esphani Nazmin, MD and Corizon, Inc. are named as additional defendants; giving the Finance Officer 21 days from this Order to submit an inmate account summary for the past six months of the Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/5/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-08/05/2020-Plaintiff and Finance Officer)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by David Brightwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Informa Pauperis, #3 Inmate Account Summary, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Brightwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brightwell v. Kasahun, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temesgen Kasahun, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCI Hospital Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Hargraves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esphani Nazmin, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?