Lucas v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle Lee Lucas
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2020cv02166
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/29/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/28/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Lee Lucas(Fyock, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Michelle Lee Lucas against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michelle Lee Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fyock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lee Lucas
Represented By: Matthew D Fyock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?