Vince's Crab House, Inc. et al v. Olszewski, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Meyer, Vincent T. Meyer and Vince's Crab House, Inc.
Defendant: Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr. and Baltimore County, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2020cv02218
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 Correspondence from Clerk re: remand of case(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #1 Acknowledgment Receipt) (krs, Deputy Clerk).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Remand; remanding case to the Circuit Court for Baltimore County; closing this case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/16/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/16/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Baltimore County, Maryland, Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr..(Marrow, Glenn)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/7/2020. (vdcs, Chambers)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time by Baltimore County, Maryland, Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ackerman, Alexa)
August 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 14637124049 (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Brenda L. Meyer, Vincent T. Meyer, Vince's Crab House, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Notice of Demand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Inquiry Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Settlement Letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Attorney Fees, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Linda)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #6 Miscellaneous Correspondence Defendants' Statement of Removal (Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/30/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR-Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/30/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-10) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baltimore County, Maryland, Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 FILED IN ERROR-THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vince's Crab House, Inc., Vincent T. Meyer, Brenda L. Meyer. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT Summons Issued as to Baltimore County, Maryland, Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Baltimore County, Maryland, Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr., filed by Vince's Crab House, Inc., Vincent T. Meyer, Brenda L. Meyer.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Correspondence re: Defendants' Statement of Removal (Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.5a Certification(Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore County, Maryland (Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by John A. Olszewski, Jr. (Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Melissa R. Hyatt (Ackerman, Alexa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-20-002735., filed by Melissa R. Hyatt, John A. Olszewski, Jr., Baltimore County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ackerman, Alexa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vince's Crab House, Inc. et al v. Olszewski, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa R. Hyatt
Represented By: Dorrell Antone Brooks
Represented By: Glenn Todd Marrow
Represented By: Alexa Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Olszewski, Jr.
Represented By: Dorrell Antone Brooks
Represented By: Glenn Todd Marrow
Represented By: Alexa Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County, Maryland
Represented By: Dorrell Antone Brooks
Represented By: Glenn Todd Marrow
Represented By: Alexa Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Meyer
Represented By: Wayne Carl Markey
Represented By: Linda K Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent T. Meyer
Represented By: Wayne Carl Markey
Represented By: Linda K Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince's Crab House, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne Carl Markey
Represented By: Linda K Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?