Lyons v. PNC Bank , N.A.
Plaintiff: William T Lyons, Jr. and William T. Lyons
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A. and PNC Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv02234
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Compel . Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/14/2020. (vals, Chambers)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Compel by William T. Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel by PNC Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 VERIFIED ANSWER to #3 Complaint by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4, #5 Exhibit #5, #6 Exhibit #6)(Tobin, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/5/2020. (vals, Chambers)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by PNC Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by PNC Bank, National Association.(Tobin, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/4/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 The above documents #3 and #4 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to PNC Bank, National Association.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against PNC Bank, National Association, filed by William T. Lyons.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc for PNC Bank, N.A..(Tobin, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Maryland, case number C-02-CV-20-001388. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8787972), filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons)(Tobin, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. PNC Bank , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Lyons
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?