One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. et al v. Stewart Asset Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. and Clockwork IP, L.L.C.
Defendant: Alice J. Stewart, Matthew J. Stewart, Incorporated Comfort, LLC, Stewart Asset Group, LLC, Matthew W. Stewart and Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02358
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why They Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Violating The Court's October 1, 2020 Order by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Justin DiBlassio, #2 Exhibit 1.1 - Email to One Hour Customers, #3 Exhibit 1.2 - Billing Text Message, #4 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Jose M. Garcia, #5 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Samuel A. Butler, #6 Exhibit 3.1 - 72 Degrees Web Captures, #7 Exhibit 4 - Affidavits of Personal Service of October 1, 2020 Order on Defendants, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Zisk, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #14 ). Mail sent to Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/30/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Amended Order) (Zisk, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 Telephone Motion Conference held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Ronda Thomas) (mds, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. re #19 Memorandum,, (Zisk, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 Supplemental to #19 Memorandum,, filed by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Supplemental Affidavits of Personal Service of Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zisk, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 Supplemental to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Personal Service Affidavits, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Samuel A. Butler, #4 Exhibit 3.1 - Email, #5 Exhibit 3.2 - Incorporated Comfort Social Media and Internet Listings, #6 Exhibit 3.3 - Incorporated Comfort Website, #7 Exhibit 3.4 - Matthew W. Stewart Master HVAC License)(Zisk, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Plaintiffs' Request for Order Granting Their Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Zisk, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Alice J. Stewart (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Matthew W. Stewart (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Matthew J. Stewart (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC, Incorporated Comfort, LLC, Alice J. Stewart, Matthew W. Stewart, Matthew J. Stewart, Stewart Asset Group, LLC (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. Zisk)(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Matthew W. Stewart served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Matthew J. Stewart served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Alice J. Stewart served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Stewart Asset Group, LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Incorporated Comfort, LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Zisk, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC, Incorporated Comfort, LLC, Alice J. Stewart, Matthew W. Stewart, Matthew J. Stewart, Stewart Asset Group, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Justin DiBlassio, #3 Exhibit 1.A - OH0035 One Hour Heating & Air Conditioning Franchise Agreement dated October 20, 2014, #4 Exhibit 1.B - OH0165 One Hour Heating & Air Conditioning Franchise Agreement dated October 20, 2014, #5 Exhibit 1.C - OH0525 One Hour Heating & Air Conditioning Franchise Agreement dated September 25, 2016, #6 Exhibit 1.D - OH0572 One Hour Heating & Air Conditioning Franchise Agreement dated November 3, 2017, #7 Exhibit 1.E - Owners Guaranties, #8 Exhibit 1.F - Franchise Agreement Territory Listings, #9 Exhibit 1.G - 72 Degrees Air Conditioning & Heating Invoice, #10 Exhibit 1.H - Incorporated Comfort, LLC Registration Documents, #11 Exhibit 1.I - Notice of Breach of Franchise Agreement and Demand to Cease and Desist Unlawful Activities dated July 10, 2020, #12 Exhibit 1.J - Notice of Default and 24-Hour Cure Notice dated July 30, 2020, #13 Exhibit 1.K - Notice of Termination dated August 4, 2020, #14 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Mark Dawson, #15 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Amie Spencer, #16 Exhibit 4 - Certification of Samuel Butler, #17 Exhibit 4.A - 72 Degrees Air Conditioning & Heating Social Media and Internet Listings, #18 Exhibit 4.B - 72 Degrees Air Conditioning & Heating Website, #19 Exhibit 4.C - ATL International, Inc. v. Baradar, No. JFM-97-3642, Bus. Franchise Guide (CCH) 11,345 (D. Md. 1997 Nov. 12, 1997), #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Zisk, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Clockwork, Inc., Corporate Parent Hidden Gem Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Villa BidCo, Inc., Corporate Parent Villa Parent, Inc., Corporate Parent Villa MidCo, Inc., Corporate Parent Villa TopCo, Inc., Corporate Parent Villa Aggregator, LP, Corporate Parent Villa GP, Inc., Other Affiliate Authority Brands Services Retail, Inc., Other Affiliate SuccessWare, Inc., Other Affiliate Mister Sparky Franchising, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Benjamin Franklin Franchising, L.L.C., Other Affiliate BuyMax, L.L.C., Other Affiliate New Millennium Academy, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Quality A/C Service, L.L.C., Other Affiliate UWIN, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Authority Brands, L.L.C. for Clockwork IP, L.L.C., One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C..(Zisk, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Zisk, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC, Incorporated Comfort, LLC, Alice J. Stewart, Matthew W. Stewart, Matthew J. Stewart, Stewart Asset Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8808657.), filed by One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C., Clockwork IP, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC, #3 Summons - Stewart Asset Group, LLC, #4 Summons - Incorporated Comfort, LLC, #5 Summons - Matthew W. Stewart, #6 Summons - Alice J. Stewart, #7 Summons - Matthew J. Stewart)(Zisk, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C. et al v. Stewart Asset Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Hour Air Conditioning Franchising, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert L Zisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clockwork IP, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert L Zisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Comfort, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Asset Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Comfort Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?