Goldman et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hinda Goldman and Jack Goldman
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW BIRMINGHAM HIP RESURFACING (BHR) HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION and Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02373
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 64. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jack Goldman, Hinda Goldman. Smith & Nephew, Inc. waiver sent on 8/29/2020, answer due 10/28/2020.(McGoldrick, Marilyn)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER in all actions re (2255 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions from Defendant Smith & Nephew. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/23/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 68. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions filed by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for September 23, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re (449 in 1:17-cv-00939-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions from Defendant Smith & Nephew (Supplemental Brief) filed by Smith & Nephew Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 68. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal SmIth & Nephew, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (2255 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions from Defendant Smith & Nephew filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C Curtin on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Curtin, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/26/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 30. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for August 26, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENCY NOTICE - Pursuant to Case Management Orders, please file the Short Form Complaint regarding this case in 17-md-2775. When prompted if you would like to spread the text, please answer no, as the complaint has already been filed in the individual case.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8812712.), filed by Jack Goldman, Hinda Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGoldrick, Marilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hinda Goldman
Represented By: Marilyn T McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Goldman
Represented By: Marilyn T McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH & NEPHEW BIRMINGHAM HIP RESURFACING (BHR) HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?