Nasir & Associates, LLC v. Tutor Perini Corporation
Plaintiff: Nasir & Associates, LLC
Defendant: Tutor Perini Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02375
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nasir & Associates, LLC (Pierce, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. Tutor Perini Corporation served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Pierce, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Tutor Perini Corporation.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8812418.), filed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Purchase Order), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Invoice 4104282), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Inv. 4104402), #4 Exhibit Ex 4 (Inv. 4104596), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons for Tutor Perini Corp)(Pierce, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasir & Associates, LLC v. Tutor Perini Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutor Perini Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasir & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?