National Urban League et al v. DeJoy et al
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause and National Urban League
Defendant: Postmaster General Louis DeJoy, US Postal Service, Louis DeJoy and United States Postal Service
Amicus Curiae: Ron Wyden, Thomas R. Carper, Tammy Duckworth, Bernard Sanders, Tammy Baldwin, Jack Reed, Mazie K. Hirono, Jacky Rosen, Richard Blumenthal, Sherrod Brown, Amy Klobuchar, Elizabeth Warren, Sheldon Whitehouse, Michael Bennet, Benjamin L. Cardin, Cory A. Booker, Patrick Leahy, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Richard J. Durbin, Edward J. Markey, Jeanne Shaheen, Tina Smith, Chris Van Hollen and United States House of Representatives
Case Number: 1:2020cv02391
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service.(Echols, Alexis)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/15/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/9/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League.(Freedman, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service(Echols, Alexis)
September 25, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by Richard Blumenthal, Tammy Baldwin, Michael Bennet, Cory A. Booker, Sherrod Brown, Benjamin L. Cardin, Thomas R. Carper, Tammy Duckworth, Richard J. Durbin, Mazie K. Hirono, Amy Klobuchar, Patrick Leahy, Edward J. Markey, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Jack Reed, Jacky Rosen, Bernard Sanders, Jeanne Shaheen, Tina Smith, Chris Van Hollen, Elizabeth Warren, Sheldon Whitehouse, Ron Wyden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zolle, Dayna)
September 25, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits to Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Text of Proposed Order)(Chernof, Kenneth)
September 25, 2020 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Urban League, League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryne Lindsey)(Chernof, Kenneth)
September 25, 2020 Filing 47 QC NOTICE: #44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause, National Urban League was filed incorrectly. **Each individual exhibit must be filed as a separate attachment to the motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File (Motion for Leave to File Brief of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by United States House of Representatives (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Letter on behalf of United States House of Representatives (Letter, Douglas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 44 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chernof, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2020 Filing 43 QC NOTICE: #40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Permanent Injunction and #41 Memorandum filed by League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause, National Urban League was filed incorrectly. **A motion, supporting memorandum, exhibits, and proposed order must be filed as one entry. The motion should be filed as the main document with the supporting memorandum, each exhibit, and proposed order as separate attachments to the main document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 42 QC NOTICE: #39 Summons Returned Executed filed by League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause, National Urban League was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed as to USA and enter the service date for the U.S. Attorney. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 41 (FILED IN ERROR) Memorandum re #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits In Support of Motion)(Chernof, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2020 Filing 40 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chernof, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2020 Filing 39 (FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Urban League, League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryne Lindsey)(Chernof, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on #35 Motion Entry of Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/21/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION for Other Relief (Entry of Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) ORder) filed by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
September 20, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Other Relief (Entry of Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) ORder) filed by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A (New York v. DeJoy Rule 502 Order), #2 Text of Proposed Order Ex B (District of Maryland Rule 502 Template Order), #3 Exhibit Ex C (Correspondence))(Freedman, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Other Relief (Entry of Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) ORder) by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/8/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jon Marshall Greenbaum. Directing attorney Jon Marshall Greenbaum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/3/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jon M. Greenbaum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8844019.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Freedman, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League.(Chernof, Kenneth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 28 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Common Cause (Bailey, Leslie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by League of Women Voters of the United States (Bailey, Leslie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Urban League (Bailey, Leslie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Echols, Alexis)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Expedite Limited Discovery as set forth. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/28/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Expedite Limited Discovery (Dkt. 22) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chernof, Kenneth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A. Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #5 Exhibit B. Requests for Production)(Chernof, Kenneth)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis J Echols on behalf of All Defendants (Echols, Alexis)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen K Wirth. Directing attorney Stephen K Wirth to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lindsey D Carson. Directing attorney Lindsey D Carson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Leslie C Bailey. Directing attorney Leslie C Bailey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Douglas A Winthrop. Directing attorney Douglas A Winthrop to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Catherine McCarthy. Directing attorney Catherine McCarthy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin T Halbig. Directing attorney Benjamin T Halbig to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew T Tutt. Directing attorney Andrew T Tutt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Allon Kedem. Directing attorney Allon Kedem to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued 60 days as to Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen K. Wirth (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816546.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey D. Carson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816519.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie C. Bailey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816499.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Winthrop (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816437.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Catherine McCarthy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816408.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin T. Halbig (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816389.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Tutt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816369.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allon Kedem (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8816295.) by Common Cause, League of Women Voters of the United States, National Urban League (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Konkel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Konkel, Kaitlin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Arak Freedman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Freedman, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8814916.), filed by National Urban League, League of Women Voters of the United States, Common Cause. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chernof, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Urban League et al v. DeJoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of the United States
Represented By: Kenneth L Chernof
Represented By: Catherine McCarthy
Represented By: Stephen K Wirth
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Jon Marshall Greenbaum
Represented By: Leslie C Bailey
Represented By: Lindsey D Carson
Represented By: Kaitlin Konkel
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Andrew T Tutt
Represented By: Douglas A Winthrop
Represented By: Benjamin T Halbig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Common Cause
Represented By: Kenneth L Chernof
Represented By: Catherine McCarthy
Represented By: Stephen K Wirth
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Jon Marshall Greenbaum
Represented By: Leslie C Bailey
Represented By: Lindsey D Carson
Represented By: Kaitlin Konkel
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Andrew T Tutt
Represented By: Douglas A Winthrop
Represented By: Benjamin T Halbig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Urban League
Represented By: Kenneth L Chernof
Represented By: Catherine McCarthy
Represented By: Stephen K Wirth
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Jon Marshall Greenbaum
Represented By: Leslie C Bailey
Represented By: Lindsey D Carson
Represented By: Kaitlin Konkel
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Andrew T Tutt
Represented By: Douglas A Winthrop
Represented By: Benjamin T Halbig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postmaster General Louis DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Represented By: Alexis J Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Alexis J Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron Wyden
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas R. Carper
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tammy Duckworth
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bernard Sanders
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tammy Baldwin
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jack Reed
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mazie K. Hirono
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jacky Rosen
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Blumenthal
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherrod Brown
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amy Klobuchar
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sheldon Whitehouse
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Bennet
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin L. Cardin
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cory A. Booker
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Patrick Leahy
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey A. Merkley
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard J. Durbin
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward J. Markey
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeanne Shaheen
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tina Smith
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chris Van Hollen
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States House of Representatives
Represented By: Douglas Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?