Crookshank v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Trudy B. Crookshank
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02399
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/30/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Case referred to United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/30/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Boston Scientific Corporation(Frederick, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A. Gomez. Directing attorney Christopher A. Gomez to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lee B Balefsky. Directing attorney Lee B Balefsky to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aaron L Dunbar. Directing attorney Aaron L Dunbar to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Gomez (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8863063.) by Trudy B. Crookshank(Shelsby, Gilbert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lee B. Balefsky (Filing fee $100.) by Trudy B. Crookshank(Shelsby, Gilbert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron L. Dunbar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8862828.) by Trudy B. Crookshank(Shelsby, Gilbert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/15/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tess Maurelia Godhardt. Directing attorney Tess Maurelia Godhardt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of M. Joseph Winebrenner. Directing attorney M. Joseph Winebrenner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearances of Jon A. Strongman, Michael A. Tanenbaum, and Michael Bonasso. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/28/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tess Maurelia Godhardt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8829317.) by Boston Scientific Corporation(Frederick, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Joseph Winebrenner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8829299.) by Boston Scientific Corporation(Frederick, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearances of Jon A. Strongman, Michael A. Tanenbaum, and Michael Bonasso by Boston Scientific Corporation(Frederick, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-01679. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #16 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #17 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #18 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #22 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #23 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #24 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 6990 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rice, #27 Exhibit ECF 4830 - Pltf_s Combined Motion and MTE Rice, #28 Exhibit ECF 7041 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rice, #29 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex A, #30 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex B, #31 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex C, #32 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex D, #33 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Memo in Opp to Pltf_s Combined Motion and MTE Rice, #34 Exhibit ECF 6046 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Rice, #35 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #37 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #42 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #43 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #44 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #45 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #46 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #47 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #48 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #49 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #50 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #51 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #52 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #53 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #54 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #55 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #56 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #57 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #58 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #59 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #60 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig, #61 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #62 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #63 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #64 Exhibit ECF 52 - BSC_s Memo MTE Guelcher, #65 Exhibit ECF 74 - Ptfs Opp to Dft_s MTE Guelcher, #66 Exhibit ECF 88 - BSC_s Reply MTE Guelcher, #67 Exhibit ECF 100 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions), #68 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #69 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #70 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #71 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #72 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 8/18/2020 to add party filer)(msa).
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition on dates and at times to be determined. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (kp) (ADI)
May 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Trudy Crookshank on May 7, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Keale, James)
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (PMA)
June 9, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Trudy B. Crookshank. (Balefsky, Lee)
March 12, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael)
March 10, 2015 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 3/9/2015. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 3/2/2015, answer due 5/1/2015. (Strongman, Jon)
March 10, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon)
February 12, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 121 (Third Amended Docket Control Order on Wave 1 and Wave 2 Discovery) entered on 01/29/2015 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw)
February 11, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3685028. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crookshank v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Tess Maurelia Godhardt
Represented By: M. Joseph Winebrenner
Represented By: James A Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy B. Crookshank
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Aaron L Dunbar
Represented By: Gilbert F Shelsby, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?