Crushing Corporation of America v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Plaintiff: Crushing Corporation of America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc and Powerpure, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02526
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Change Venue; Transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim by Crushing Corporation of America.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Crushing Corporation of America's Opposition to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff/Third Party Plaintiff C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings and Request For Hearing filed by Crushing Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Third Party Summons Issued 21 days as to Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc, Powerpure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC re #10 Third Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Rice, Heather)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 COUNTERCLAIM against Crushing Corporation of America, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Third Party Complaint filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC was filed missing information. **Please file third party summons using the event Notice (Other) and link to #10 Third Party Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Powerpure, LLC, Holmbury, Inc, Holmbury Group, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) Modified on 9/9/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rice, Heather)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Status Report Submitted Statement Concerning Removal by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Rice, Heather)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crushing Corporation of America identifying Other Affiliate The Berg Corporation, Other Affiliate NickelA, Inc., Other Affiliate BOW, Inc. for Crushing Corporation of America.(Sorteberg, Kenneth)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Raymond, Kerry)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/2/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against C. Norris Manufacturing LLC filed by Crushing Corporation of America.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-003100. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8838864), filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Writ of Summons, #5 Exhibit 3 - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report)(Rice, Heather)
September 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crushing Corporation of America v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crushing Corporation of America
Represented By: Kenneth K Sorteberg
Represented By: Kevin B Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Powerpure, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?